Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Zenobio Lorenzo Guilland

Deceased

Archbishop of Paraná, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Dec 1890Born
28 Oct 191423.8Ordained PriestPriest
18 Sep 193443.7AppointedArchbishop of Paraná, Argentina
3 Mar 193544.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Paraná, Argentina
23 Mar 193544.2InstalledArchbishop of Paraná, Argentina
12 Feb 196271.1DiedArchbishop of Paraná, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Zenobio Lorenzo Guilland
Archbishop Zenobio Lorenzo Guilland (born , died ) Archbishop of Paraná

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Andrés de Giles

  • a priest for 47.2 years
  • a bishop for 26.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,935, Number 14
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 8, Number 381, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast