Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Estanislao Esteban Cardinal Karlic

Archbishop Emeritus of Paraná

Cardinal-Priest of Beata Maria Vergine Addolorata a piazza Buenos Aires


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Feb 1926 BornOliva
8 Dec 195428.8Ordained PriestPriest
6 Jun 197751.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Córdoba, Argentina
6 Jun 197751.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Castrum
15 Aug 197751.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castrum
19 Jan 198356.9AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Paraná, Argentina
20 Mar 198357.1InstalledCoadjutor Archbishop of Paraná, Argentina
1 Apr 198660.2SucceededArchbishop of Paraná, Argentina
29 Apr 200377.2RetiredArchbishop of Paraná, Argentina
24 Nov 200781.8Elevated to Cardinal
24 Nov 200781.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Beata Maria Vergine Addolorata a piazza Buenos Aires
2 Feb 200882.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of Beata Maria Vergine Addolorata a piazza Buenos Aires

MicroData Summary for Estanislao Esteban Karlic:
Estanislao Esteban Cardinal Karlic (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Paraná

Please contact the Cardinal through the Archdiocese of Paraná.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
  • a cardinal for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 9 May 2014