Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Marino

Bishop Emeritus of Mar del Plata, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Mar 1942 Born
12 Nov 197129.6Ordained PriestPriest of Buenos Aires, Argentina
11 Apr 200361.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of La Plata, Argentina
11 Apr 200361.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Basti
31 May 200361.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Basti
6 Apr 201169.0AppointedBishop of Mar del Plata, Argentina
4 Jun 201169.2InstalledBishop of Mar del Plata, Argentina
18 Jul 201775.3RetiredBishop of Mar del Plata, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Antonio Marino
Bishop Antonio Marino (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Mar del Plata

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuenos Aires

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Mar del Plata.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 6 Apr 2011
  • i: CB, 9 Apr 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Number 14,401
  • r: Bollettino, 18 Jul 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Jul 2017