Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfredo Guillermo Disandro

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Villa María


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jun 1922BornCórdoba
3 Dec 195028.5Ordained PriestPriest of Córdoba, Argentina
24 Feb 197552.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Córdoba, Argentina
24 Feb 197552.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Vicus Turris
20 Apr 197552.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vicus Turris
16 Apr 198057.9AppointedBishop of Villa María, Argentina
18 May 198057.9InstalledBishop of Villa María, Argentina
23 Jun 199876.0RetiredBishop of Villa María, Argentina
1 Jul 200179.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Villa María, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Alfredo Guillermo Disandro:
Bishop Alfredo Guillermo Disandro (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Villa María

  • a priest for 50.6 years
  • a bishop for 26.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013