Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Blas Victorio Conrero

Deceased

Archbishop of Tucumán


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Apr 1923BornSilvio Pellico
20 Sep 194724.4Ordained PriestPriest
3 Feb 196844.8AppointedArchbishop of Tucumán, Argentina
21 Apr 196845.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Tucumán, Argentina
26 May 196845.1InstalledArchbishop of Tucumán, Argentina
7 Jul 198259.2DiedArchbishop of Tucumán, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Blas Victorio Conrero:
Archbishop Blas Victorio Conrero (born , died ) Archbishop of Tucumán

  • a priest for 34.8 years
  • a bishop for 14.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013