Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Raúl Francisco Cardinal Primatesta

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Córdoba

Cardinal-Priest of Beata Maria Vergine Addolorata a piazza Buenos Aires


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Apr 1919BornCapilla del Señor
25 Oct 194223.5Ordained PriestPriest of La Plata, Argentina
14 Jun 195738.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of La Plata, Argentina
14 Jun 195738.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Tanais
15 Aug 195738.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tanais
12 Jun 196142.1AppointedBishop of San Rafael, Argentina
11 Nov 196142.5InstalledBishop of San Rafael, Argentina
16 Feb 196545.8AppointedArchbishop of Córdoba, Argentina
5 Mar 197353.8Elevated to Cardinal
5 Mar 197353.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Beata Maria Vergine Addolorata a piazza Buenos Aires
17 Nov 199879.5RetiredArchbishop of Córdoba, Argentina
1 May 200687.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Córdoba, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Raúl Francisco Primatesta:
Raúl Francisco Cardinal Primatesta (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Córdoba

  • a priest for 63.5 years
  • a bishop for 48.7 years
  • a cardinal for 33.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 12 Jul 2015