Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Adolfo Servando Tortolo

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Paraná


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Nov 1911BornNueve de Julio
21 Dec 193423.1Ordained PriestPriest
5 Jun 195644.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paraná, Argentina
5 Jun 195644.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Caeciri
12 Aug 195644.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Caeciri
11 Feb 196048.2AppointedBishop of Catamarca, Argentina
30 Apr 196048.4InstalledBishop of Catamarca, Argentina
6 Sep 196250.8AppointedArchbishop of Paraná, Argentina
29 Dec 196251.1InstalledArchbishop of Paraná, Argentina
7 Jul 197563.6AppointedBishop of Argentina, Military
30 Mar 198270.3RetiredBishop of Argentina, Military
1 Apr 198674.3RetiredArchbishop of Paraná, Argentina
5 Feb 199886.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Paraná, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Adolfo Servando Tortolo:
Archbishop Adolfo Servando Tortolo (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Paraná

  • a priest for 63.1 years
  • a bishop for 41.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1956, Number 68

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015