Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ramón Alfredo Dus

Archbishop of Resistencia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 May 1956 BornSan Lorenzo
8 Dec 198024.5Ordained PriestPriest of Paraná, Argentina
5 Aug 200549.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Reconquista, Argentina
5 Aug 200549.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Thibica
17 Sep 200549.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thibica
26 Mar 200851.8AppointedBishop of Reconquista, Argentina
21 Feb 201356.7AppointedArchbishop of Resistencia, Argentina
3 May 201356.9InstalledArchbishop of Resistencia, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Ramón Alfredo Dus:
Archbishop Ramón Alfredo Dus (born ) Archbishop of Resistencia

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Resistencia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 5 Aug 2005
  • ab: Bollettino, 26 Mar 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 182, Number 14,976
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Feb 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 18 Oct 2013