Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Resistencia

Archidioecesis Resistenciae



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Ramón Alfredo Dus, Archbishop
  • Fabriciano Sigampa, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 28 February 1984
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Argentina
  • Square Kilometers: 28,250 (10,911 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Arzobispado, Bartolome Mitre 363, H3500BLG Resistencia [Chaco], Argentina
  • Telephone: (03722)434.573
  • Fax: (same)

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Resistencia
3 June 1939ErectedArchdiocese of Santa Fe Diocese of Resistencia (erected)
11 February 1957Territory LostDiocese of Resistencia Diocese of Formosa (erected)
12 August 1963Territory LostDiocese of Resistencia Diocese of Presidencia Roque Sáenz Peña (erected)
Archdiocese of Resistencia
28 February 1984ElevatedDiocese of Resistencia Archdiocese of Resistencia

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Resistencia
1950375,000583,00064.3%1259715,281657424ap1951
1966247,000280,00088.2%1543584,258444717ap1967
1970280,000325,00086.2%1542574,912456018ap1971
1976255,000280,00091.1%1148594,322517721ap1977
1980261,000308,00084.7%1248604,350507924ap1981
Archdiocese of Resistencia
1990303,000354,00085.6%2236585,2243810625ap1991
1999410,000483,20084.9%3634705,85714311030ap2000
2000410,000483,80084.7%3734715,77415211530ap2001
2001423,700498,50585.0%3633696,14015511830ap2002
2002429,000505,46584.9%3532676,40214810930ap2003
2003450,000525,00085.7%3030607,50074510630ap2004
2004450,000540,00083.3%3132637,142104910530ap2005
2010495,000595,00083.2%3426608,25014348130ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 14 Apr 2013