Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juan José Iriarte

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Resistencia, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1913Born
20 Sep 194733.7Ordained PriestPriest
23 Oct 195743.8AppointedBishop of Reconquista, Argentina
27 Dec 195744.0Ordained BishopBishop of Reconquista, Argentina
12 Jan 195844.0InstalledBishop of Reconquista, Argentina
28 Feb 198470.2AppointedArchbishop of Resistencia, Argentina
9 Nov 199177.9RetiredArchbishop of Resistencia, Argentina
16 Aug 199985.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Resistencia, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Juan José Iriarte
Archbishop Juan José Iriarte (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Resistencia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuenos Aires

  • a priest for 51.9 years
  • a bishop for 41.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018