Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Vicente Faustino Zazpe

Deceased

Archbishop of Santa Fe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1920BornBuenos Aires
28 Nov 194828.7Ordained PriestPriest of Buenos Aires, Argentina
12 Jun 196141.3AppointedBishop of Rafaela, Argentina
3 Sep 196141.5Ordained BishopBishop of Rafaela, Argentina
12 Oct 196141.6InstalledBishop of Rafaela, Argentina
3 Aug 196848.4AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Santa Fe, Argentina
3 Aug 196848.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Aquaviva
26 Oct 196848.6InstalledCoadjutor Archbishop of Santa Fe, Argentina
13 Aug 196949.4SucceededArchbishop of Santa Fe, Argentina
24 Jan 198463.9DiedArchbishop of Santa Fe, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Vicente Faustino Zazpe:
Archbishop Vicente Faustino Zazpe (born , died ) Archbishop of Santa Fe

  • a priest for 35.1 years
  • a bishop for 22.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015