Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Alfredo Brasca

Deceased

Bishop of Rafaela, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Aug 1919Born
18 Dec 194324.3Ordained PriestPriest
30 Dec 196849.3AppointedBishop of Rafaela, Argentina
16 Mar 196949.5Ordained BishopBishop of Rafaela, Argentina
26 Jun 197656.8DiedBishop of Rafaela, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Antonio Alfredo Brasca
Bishop Antonio Alfredo Brasca (born , died ) Bishop of Rafaela

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCañada de Gomez

  • a priest for 32.5 years
  • a bishop for 7.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast