Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio María Aguirre

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of San Isidro, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1908Born
18 Sep 194335.0Ordained PriestPriest of Buenos Aires, Argentina
13 Mar 195748.5AppointedBishop of San Isidro, Argentina
9 Jun 195748.7Ordained BishopBishop of San Isidro, Argentina
13 May 198576.6RetiredBishop of San Isidro, Argentina
2 Jun 198778.7DiedBishop Emeritus of San Isidro, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Antonio María Aguirre
Bishop Antonio María Aguirre (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of San Isidro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuenos Aires

  • a priest for 43.7 years
  • a bishop for 29.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018