Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emilio Bianchi di Cárcano

Bishop Emeritus of Azul


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Apr 1930 BornBuenos Aires
14 Aug 196030.3Ordained PriestPriest
24 Feb 197645.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Azul, Argentina
24 Feb 197645.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Lesina
25 Mar 197645.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lesina
14 Apr 198252.0AppointedBishop of Azul, Argentina
31 May 198252.1InstalledBishop of Azul, Argentina
24 May 200676.1RetiredBishop of Azul, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Emilio Bianchi di Cárcano:
Bishop Emilio Bianchi di Cárcano (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Azul

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Azul.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 24 May 2006

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015