Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fernando María Bargalló

Bishop Emeritus of Merlo-Moreno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Dec 1954 BornBuenos Aires
15 Aug 197823.7Ordained PriestPriest
27 Apr 199439.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Morón, Argentina
27 Apr 199439.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Hirina
31 May 199439.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hirina
13 May 199742.4AppointedBishop of Merlo-Moreno, Argentina
28 Jun 199742.5InstalledBishop of Merlo-Moreno, Argentina
26 Jun 201257.5ResignedBishop of Merlo-Moreno, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Fernando María Bargalló:
Bishop Fernando María Bargalló (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Merlo-Moreno

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Merlo-Moreno.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 139, Number 12,346
  • r: Bollettino, 26 Jun 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013