Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Marengo

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Azul


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1906BornTeodolina
22 Dec 192822.8Ordained PriestPriest
20 Feb 195044.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santa Fe, Argentina
20 Feb 195044.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Carrhae
6 Aug 195044.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Carrhae
22 Sep 195650.6AppointedBishop of Azul, Argentina
24 Nov 195650.8InstalledBishop of Azul, Argentina
14 Apr 198276.2RetiredBishop of Azul, Argentina
17 Nov 198882.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Azul, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Manuel Marengo:
Bishop Manuel Marengo (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Azul

  • a priest for 59.9 years
  • a bishop for 38.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1950, Number 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013