Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Moisés Julio Blanchoud

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Salta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Sep 1923BornEsperanza
14 Dec 194724.2Ordained PriestPriest
13 Feb 196036.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Río Cuarto, Argentina
13 Feb 196036.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Belali
24 Apr 196036.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Belali
6 Sep 196239.0AppointedBishop of Río Cuarto, Argentina
7 Mar 196339.5InstalledBishop of Río Cuarto, Argentina
7 Jan 198460.3AppointedArchbishop of Salta, Argentina
31 Mar 198460.5InstalledArchbishop of Salta, Argentina
6 Aug 199975.9RetiredArchbishop of Salta, Argentina
1 Oct 200279.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Santa Fe de la Vera Cruz, Argentina
30 Mar 200379.5CeasedApostolic Administrator of Santa Fe de la Vera Cruz, Argentina
28 Feb 201692.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Salta, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Moisés Julio Blanchoud
Archbishop Moisés Julio Blanchoud (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Salta

  • a priest for 68.2 years
  • a bishop for 55.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1960, Number 30
  • d: CB, 28 Feb 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 29 Feb 2016