Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Mario Antonio Cargnello

Archbishop of Salta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Mar 1952 BornSan Fernando del Vale de Catamarca
8 Nov 197523.6Ordained PriestPriest
7 Apr 199442.0AppointedBishop of Orán, Argentina
24 Jun 199442.2Ordained BishopBishop of Orán, Argentina
16 Jul 199442.3InstalledBishop of Orán, Argentina
24 Jun 199846.2AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Salta, Argentina
3 Sep 199846.4InstalledCoadjutor Archbishop of Salta, Argentina
6 Aug 199947.3SucceededArchbishop of Salta, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Mario Antonio Cargnello:
Archbishop Mario Antonio Cargnello (born ) Archbishop of Salta

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Salta.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140, Number 12,427

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015