Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Antonio Scozzina, O.F.M.

Bishop of Orán, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 May 1951 Born
9 Mar 198028.8Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor
4 Oct 198029.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
6 Apr 201866.9AppointedBishop of Orán, Argentina
18 May 201867.0Ordained BishopBishop of Orán, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Luis Antonio Scozzina
Bishop Luis Antonio Scozzina O.F.M. (born ) Bishop of Orán

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Lorenzo, Diocese of Rosario
Ordained BishopSan Ramón Nonato, Cathedral, Orán, Diocese of Orán

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Orán.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Apr 2018
  • bpd/sole/op: CB, 6 Apr 2018
  • ob: CB, 15 Apr 2018
  • c2+: CB, 2 May 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 18 May 2018

Quantcast