Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Eduardo Eliseo Martín

Archbishop of Rosario


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Dec 1953 BornVenado Tuerto
26 Dec 198027.0Ordained PriestPriest of Venado Tuerto, Argentina
21 Feb 200652.2AppointedBishop of Villa de la Concepción del Río Cuarto, Argentina
19 May 200652.4Ordained BishopBishop of Villa de la Concepción del Río Cuarto, Argentina
28 May 200652.4InstalledBishop of Villa de la Concepción del Río Cuarto, Argentina
4 Jul 201460.5AppointedArchbishop of Rosario, Argentina
24 Aug 201460.7InstalledArchbishop of Rosario, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Eduardo Eliseo Martín:
Archbishop Eduardo Eliseo Martín (born ) Archbishop of Rosario

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Rosario.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Feb 2006
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Number 15,157
  • ab: Bollettino, 4 Jul 2014
  • i: CB, 15 Jul 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 16 Jul 2014