Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Guillermo José Garlatti

Archbishop Emeritus of Bahía Blanca, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jul 1940 Born
5 Jul 196423.9Ordained PriestPriest of La Plata, Argentina
27 Aug 199454.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of La Plata, Argentina
27 Aug 199454.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Aquae Regiae
30 Nov 199454.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aquae Regiae
20 Feb 199756.6AppointedBishop of San Rafael, Argentina
8 May 199756.8InstalledBishop of San Rafael, Argentina
11 Mar 200362.6AppointedArchbishop of Bahía Blanca, Argentina
10 May 200362.8InstalledArchbishop of Bahía Blanca, Argentina
12 Jul 201777.0RetiredArchbishop of Bahía Blanca, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Guillermo José Garlatti (VIAF: 6758803)
Archbishop Guillermo José Garlatti (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Bahía Blanca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceForgaria, Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Bahía Blanca.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140, Number 12,452
  • r: Bollettino, 12 Jul 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Jul 2017