Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jorge Luis Wagner

Auxiliary Bishop of Bahía Blanca, Argentina

Titular Bishop of Gergis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jan 1967 Born
2 Sep 199326.6Ordained PriestPriest of Bahía Blanca, Argentina
24 Sep 201952.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bahía Blanca, Argentina
24 Sep 201952.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Gergis
16 Nov 201952.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gergis

MicroData Summary for Jorge Luis Wagner
Bishop Jorge Luis Wagner (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Bahía Blanca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGuaminí, Archdiocese of Bahía Blanca
Ordained BishopChurch, San José Obrero, Archdiocese of Bahía Blanca

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Bahía Blanca.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 Sep 2019
  • c1: CB, 24 Sep 2019
  • ob/c2: CB, 27 Sep 2019
  • c34: CB, 26 Oct 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.5, 5 Oct 2019; Data: 18 Nov 2019

Quantcast