Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Néstor Hugo Navarro

Bishop Emeritus of Alto Valle del Río Negro, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Mar 1934 Born
21 Dec 196834.7Ordained PriestPriest of Bahía Blanca, Argentina
15 Apr 199864.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bahía Blanca, Argentina
15 Apr 199864.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Rotdon
1 Jun 199864.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rotdon
19 Mar 200368.9AppointedBishop of Alto Valle del Río Negro, Argentina
10 Feb 201075.8RetiredBishop of Alto Valle del Río Negro, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Néstor Hugo Navarro
Bishop Néstor Hugo Navarro (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Alto Valle del Río Negro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCabildo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Alto Valle del Río Negro.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 10 Feb 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Number 13,333

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Jul 2017