Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Rómulo García

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Bahía Blanca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Mar 1927BornNecochea
10 Dec 195023.7Ordained PriestPriest of Mar del Plata, Argentina
9 Aug 197548.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mar del Plata, Argentina
9 Aug 197548.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Uzita
24 Sep 197548.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Uzita
19 Jan 197648.8AppointedBishop of Mar del Plata, Argentina
19 Feb 197648.9InstalledBishop of Mar del Plata, Argentina
31 May 199164.2AppointedArchbishop of Bahía Blanca, Argentina
24 Sep 199164.5InstalledArchbishop of Bahía Blanca, Argentina
15 Jun 200275.2RetiredArchbishop of Bahía Blanca, Argentina
18 Dec 200578.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Bahía Blanca, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Rómulo García:
Archbishop Rómulo García (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Bahía Blanca

  • a priest for 55.0 years
  • a bishop for 30.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013