Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Emilio Ogñénovich

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Mercedes-Luján


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jan 1923BornOlavarría
17 Dec 194926.9Ordained PriestPriest of Mercedes, Argentina
1 Oct 197956.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bahía Blanca, Argentina
1 Oct 197956.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Mibiarca
18 Nov 197956.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mibiarca
8 Jun 198259.4AppointedBishop of Mercedes, Argentina
10 Jun 198259.4InstalledBishop of Mercedes, Argentina
21 Nov 199774.8AppointedArchbishop of Mercedes-Luján, Argentina
7 Mar 200077.1RetiredArchbishop of Mercedes-Luján, Argentina
29 Jan 201188.0DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Mercedes-Luján, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Emilio Ogñénovich:
Archbishop Emilio Ogñénovich (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Mercedes-Luján

  • a priest for 61.1 years
  • a bishop for 31.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013