Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alejo Benedicto Gilligan

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nueve de Julio, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 May 1916Born
6 Dec 194226.5Ordained PriestPriest
19 Jul 196953.1AppointedBishop of Nueve de Julio, Argentina
4 Oct 196953.4Ordained BishopBishop of Nueve de Julio, Argentina
28 Aug 199175.3RetiredBishop of Nueve de Julio, Argentina
17 Jul 200791.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Nueve de Julio, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Alejo Benedicto Gilligan
Bishop Alejo Benedicto Gilligan (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nueve de Julio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoberts
Ordained BishopNueve de Julio, Diocese of Nueve de Julio

  • a priest for 64.6 years
  • a bishop for 37.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 8, Number 381

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast