Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Mariano Antonio Espinosa

Deceased

Archbishop of Buenos Aires


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jul 1844BornBuenos Aires
11 Apr 186823.8Ordained PriestPriest of Buenos Aires, Argentina
15 Jun 189349.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
15 Jun 189349.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Tiberiopolis
22 Oct 189349.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tiberiopolis
8 Feb 189853.6AppointedBishop of La Plata, Argentina
24 Apr 189853.8InstalledBishop of La Plata, Argentina
31 Aug 190056.2AppointedArchbishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
18 Nov 190056.4InstalledArchbishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
8 Apr 192378.8DiedArchbishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Mariano Antonio Espinosa:
Archbishop Mariano Antonio Espinosa (born , died ) Archbishop of Buenos Aires

  • a priest for 55.0 years
  • a bishop for 29.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Number 15,718
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 459, and Page 553
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 567

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013