Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aquilino Ferreyra y Alvarez

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Córdoba (Tucumán)

Titular Bishop of Amisus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jan 1824BornRosario
28 Jan 185531.1Ordained PriestPriest
16 Nov 189975.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
16 Nov 189975.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Amisus
19 Aug 190076.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amisus
23 Sep 191086.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina

MicroData Summary for Aquilino Ferreyra y Alvarez:
Bishop Aquilino Ferreyra y Alvarez (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Córdoba (Tucumán)

  • a priest for 55.7 years
  • a bishop for 10.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 96
  • ob/obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013