Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filemón Cabanillas

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina

Titular Bishop of Circesium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jan 1843Born
16 Nov 189956.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina
16 Nov 189956.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Circesium
24 Aug 190057.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Circesium
25 Jan 191370.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Córdoba (Tucumán), Argentina

MicroData Summary for Filemón Cabanillas
Bishop Filemón Cabanillas (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Córdoba (Tucumán)

EventPlace
Birth PlacePunilla

  • a bishop for 12.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 205
  • ob/obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 194, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018