Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gregorio Ignacio Romero

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina

Titular Bishop of Iasus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jul 1860Born
25 Feb 188322.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
4 Mar 188322.5Ordained PriestPriest
19 Jun 189938.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
19 Jun 189938.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Iasus
24 Sep 189939.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Iasus
21 Feb 191554.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Gregorio Ignacio Romero (VIAF: 310579690)
Bishop Gregorio Ignacio Romero (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires

EventPlace
Birth PlaceConcordia, Diocese of Paraná
Ordained BishopSanta Fé

  • a priest for 31.9 years
  • a bishop for 15.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 316
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1899, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Jun 2017