Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rinaldo Fidel Brédice

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Santa Rosa, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1932Born
22 Dec 195624.2Ordained PriestPriest
31 Jan 199259.3AppointedBishop of Santa Rosa, Argentina
19 Mar 199259.5Ordained BishopBishop of Santa Rosa, Argentina
24 Jun 200875.7RetiredBishop of Santa Rosa, Argentina
14 Apr 201885.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Santa Rosa, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Rinaldo Fidel Brédice
Bishop Rinaldo Fidel Brédice (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Santa Rosa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArmstrong
Ordained BishopSanta Rosa de Lima, Cathedral, Santa Rosa, Diocese of Santa Rosa
Death PlaceClínica Argentina, General Pico
Buried Place (Original)Santa Rosa de Lima, Cathedral, Santa Rosa, Diocese of Santa Rosa

  • a priest for 61.3 years
  • a bishop for 26.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 24 Jun 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131, Number 11,766
  • d: CB, 14 Apr 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 17 Apr 2018