Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Sergio Alfredo Fenoy

Archbishop of Santa Fe de la Vera Cruz, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 May 1959 Born
2 Dec 198324.5Ordained PriestPriest of Rosario, Argentina
3 Apr 199939.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Rosario, Argentina
3 Apr 199939.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Satafis
21 May 199940.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Satafis
5 Dec 200647.5AppointedBishop of San Miguel, Argentina
17 Apr 201858.9AppointedArchbishop of Santa Fe de la Vera Cruz, Argentina
9 Jun 201859.0InstalledArchbishop of Santa Fe de la Vera Cruz, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Sergio Alfredo Fenoy (VIAF: 313252068)
Archbishop Sergio Alfredo Fenoy (born ) Archbishop of Santa Fe de la Vera Cruz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRosario, Archdiocese of Rosario
Ordained BishopSantísimo Sacramento, Church, Rosario, Archdiocese of Rosario

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Santa Fe de la Vera Cruz.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 5 Dec 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 155, Number 13,559
  • ab: Bollettino, 17 Apr 2018
  • i: CB, 25 Apr 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast