Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Armando Collazuol

Bishop of Concordia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Feb 1948 BornRosario
29 Sep 197426.6Ordained PriestPriest of Rosario, Argentina
31 Dec 199749.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Rosario, Argentina
31 Dec 199749.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Elo
27 Mar 199850.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Elo
21 Jul 200456.4AppointedBishop of Concordia, Argentina
11 Oct 200456.7InstalledBishop of Concordia, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Luis Armando Collazuol:
Bishop Luis Armando Collazuol (born ) Bishop of Concordia

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Concordia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Number 13,261

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013