Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Héctor Sabatino Cardelli

Bishop of San Nicolás de los Arroyos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Aug 1941 BornGodoy
21 Sep 196827.1Ordained PriestPriest of Rosario, Argentina
13 May 199553.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Rosario, Argentina
13 May 199553.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Furnos Maior
14 Jul 199553.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Furnos Maior
2 May 199856.7AppointedBishop of Concordia, Argentina
4 Jul 199856.8InstalledBishop of Concordia, Argentina
21 Feb 200462.5AppointedBishop of San Nicolás de los Arroyos, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Héctor Sabatino Cardelli:
Bishop Héctor Sabatino Cardelli (born ) Bishop of San Nicolás de los Arroyos

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Nicolás de los Arroyos.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143, Number 12,598

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013