Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of San Nicolás de los Arroyos

Dioecesis Sancti Nicolai de los Arroyos



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 3 March 1947
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Rosario
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Argentina
  • Square Kilometers: 14,500 (5,600 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Calle Bartolome Mitre 84, 2900 San Nicolas [Buenos Aires], Argentina
  • Telephone: (03461) 429.529
  • Fax: 422.364

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
3 March 1947ErectedArchdiocese of La Plata
Diocese of Mercedes
Diocese of San Nicolás de los Arroyos (erected)
11 February 1957Territory LostArchdiocese of La Plata
Diocese of San Nicolás de los Arroyos
Diocese of San Isidro (erected)
27 March 1976Territory LostDiocese of San Isidro
Diocese of San Nicolás de los Arroyos
Diocese of Zárate-Campana (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1966495,000500,00099.0%4936855,8234517740ap1967
1970510,000530,00096.2%4636826,2195017444ap1971
1976585,000610,00095.9%5430846,9644621846ap1977
1980395,000405,00097.5%4919685,8082814042ap1981
1990497,000525,00094.7%5515707,10012212042ap1991
1999390,000426,07691.5%6712794,9367169851ap2000
2000390,000427,00091.3%839924,2396139851ap2001
2001390,000427,00091.3%819904,3336139851ap2002
2002390,000427,00091.3%103111143,4216177852ap2003
2003390,000427,00091.3%9891073,64461512050ap2004
2004390,000427,00091.3%809894,38261512051ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2011
code: v2.7.5, 23 Nov 2011; data: 3 Dec 2011