Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hugo Norberto Santiago

Bishop of San Nicolás de los Arroyos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Apr 1954 BornMaría Juana
19 Dec 198531.6Ordained PriestPriest of Rafaela, Argentina
5 Dec 200652.6AppointedBishop of Santo Tomé, Argentina
19 Mar 200752.9Ordained BishopBishop of Santo Tomé, Argentina
21 Sep 201662.4AppointedBishop of San Nicolás de los Arroyos, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Hugo Norberto Santiago (VIAF: 314896427)
Bishop Hugo Norberto Santiago (born ) Bishop of San Nicolás de los Arroyos

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Nicolás de los Arroyos.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 5 Dec 2006
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 188, Number 15,352
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Sep 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 21 Sep 2016