Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gustavo Gabriel Zurbriggen

Prelate of Deán Funes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Nov 1963 BornCurupaity (Santa Fe)
26 Oct 199026.9Ordained PriestPriest of Rafaela, Argentina
12 Oct 201147.9AppointedCoadjutor Prelate of Deán Funes, Argentina
9 Dec 201148.0Ordained BishopCoadjutor Prelate of Deán Funes, Argentina
21 Dec 201350.1SucceededPrelate of Deán Funes, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Gustavo Gabriel Zurbriggen:
Bishop Gustavo Gabriel Zurbriggen (born ) Prelate of Deán Funes

Please contact the Bishop through the Territorial Prelature of Deán Funes.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Oct 2011
  • ob/c23: CB, 13 Oct 2011
  • c2+: CB, 25 Nov 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Number 17,187
  • s: Bollettino, 21 Dec 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 21 Dec 2013