Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aurelio José Kühn Hergenreder, O.F.M.

Prelate Emeritus of Deán Funes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1938 BornAldea Santa Maria
11 Aug 196324.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
18 Jan 200061.1AppointedPrelate of Deán Funes, Argentina
25 Mar 200061.3Ordained BishopPrelate of Deán Funes, Argentina
8 Apr 200061.3InstalledPrelate of Deán Funes, Argentina
21 Dec 201375.0RetiredPrelate of Deán Funes, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Aurelio José Kühn Hergenreder:
Bishop Aurelio José Kühn Hergenreder O.F.M. (born ) Prelate Emeritus of Deán Funes

Please contact the Bishop through the Territorial Prelature of Deán Funes.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Number 13,726
  • r: Bollettino, 21 Dec 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 21 Dec 2013