Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lucas Luis Dónnelly Carey, O. de M. †

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Deán Funes, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jul 1921Born
16 Mar 193513.6EnteredMember of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
18 Jan 194018.4Simple VowsMember of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
18 Jan 194321.4Solemn VowsMember of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
21 Dec 194625.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mercy
30 Dec 198059.4AppointedPrelate of Deán Funes, Argentina
6 Jan 198159.4Ordained BishopPrelate of Deán Funes, Argentina
14 Mar 198159.6InstalledPrelate of Deán Funes, Argentina
18 Jan 200078.4RetiredPrelate of Deán Funes, Argentina
31 Aug 201291.0DiedPrelate Emeritus of Deán Funes, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Lucas Luis Dónnelly Carey
Bishop Lucas Luis Dónnelly Carey O. de M. (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of Deán Funes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGeneral Cabrera

  • a priest for 65.6 years
  • a bishop for 31.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 2 Sep 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)
  • c1/qodm: CB, 19 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast