Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlos Humberto Malfa

Bishop of Chascomús


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Nov 1948 BornMar del Plata
28 Dec 197830.1Ordained PriestPriest
20 May 200051.5AppointedBishop of Chascomús, Argentina
21 Jul 200051.6Ordained BishopBishop of Chascomús, Argentina
29 Jul 200051.7InstalledBishop of Chascomús, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Carlos Humberto Malfa:
Bishop Carlos Humberto Malfa (born ) Bishop of Chascomús

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Chascomús.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Number 13,809

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015