Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlos María Domínguez, O.A.R.

Auxiliary Bishop of San Juan de Cuyo, Argentina

Titular Bishop of Vita


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Dec 1965 Born
1 Feb 198721.1Simple VowsMember of Order of Augustinian Recollects
15 Mar 199226.2Solemn VowsMember of Order of Augustinian Recollects
12 Sep 199226.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Augustinian Recollects
13 Mar 199327.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Augustinian Recollects
22 Apr 201953.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Juan de Cuyo, Argentina
22 Apr 201953.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Vita
29 Jun 201953.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vita

MicroData Summary for Carlos María Domínguez
Bishop Carlos María Domínguez O.A.R. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of San Juan de Cuyo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Martín, Archdiocese of Buenos Aires
Ordained PriestVilla Maipú, Diocese of San Martín
Ordained Bishopstade Aldo Cantoni, Parque de Mayo, San Juan de Cuyo, Archdiocese of San Juan de Cuyo

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of San Juan de Cuyo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Apr 2019
  • prof/c1: CB, 22 Apr 2019
  • ob: CB, 25 Apr 2019
  • c2+: CB, 30 May 2019
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 240, Number 20,170

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast