Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Luís Azcona Hermoso, O.A.R.

Prelate Emeritus of Marajó, Para, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Mar 1940 Born
22 Sep 195818.4ProfessedMember of Order of Augustinian Recollects
21 Dec 196323.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Augustinian Recollects
16 Feb 198746.8AppointedPrelate of Marajó, Para, Brazil
5 Apr 198747.0Ordained BishopPrelate of Marajó, Para, Brazil
1 Jun 201676.1RetiredPrelate of Marajó, Para, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Luís Azcona Hermoso
Bishop José Luís Azcona Hermoso O.A.R. (born ) Prelate Emeritus of Marajó

EventPlace
Birth PlacePamplona, Spain

Please contact the Bishop through the Territorial Prelature of Marajó.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,409
  • r: Bollettino, 1 Jun 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018