Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alberto Gaudêncio Ramos

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Belém do Pará, Para


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Mar 1915BornBelém do Pará
1 Oct 193924.5Ordained PriestPriest of Belém do Pará, Para, Brazil
30 Aug 194833.4AppointedBishop of Amazonas, Brazil
1 Jan 194933.8Ordained BishopBishop of Amazonas, Brazil
16 Feb 195236.9AppointedArchbishop of Manaus, Amazonas, Brazil
9 May 195742.1AppointedArchbishop of Belém do Pará, Para, Brazil
4 Jul 199075.3RetiredArchbishop of Belém do Pará, Para, Brazil
26 Nov 199176.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Belém do Pará, Para, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Alberto Gaudêncio Ramos:
Archbishop Alberto Gaudêncio Ramos (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Belém do Pará

  • a priest for 52.2 years
  • a bishop for 42.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1949, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013