Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Maria Rivato, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ponta de Pedras, Para


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1924BornS. Giovanni Ilarione, Italy
29 Jun 195126.6Ordained PriestPriest
5 Jan 195934.1ProfessedPriest of Society of Jesus
29 Apr 196540.4AppointedPrelate of Ponta de Pedras, Para, Brazil
13 Jun 196742.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Germania in Numidia
6 Aug 196742.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Germania in Numidia
26 May 197853.5ResignedTitular Bishop of Germania in Numidia
16 Oct 197954.9AppointedBishop of Ponta de Pedras, Para, Brazil
16 Jan 200277.1RetiredBishop of Ponta de Pedras, Para, Brazil
20 Aug 201186.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Ponta de Pedras, Para, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Angelo Maria Rivato:
Bishop Angelo Maria Rivato S.J. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ponta de Pedras

  • a priest for 60.1 years
  • a bishop for 44.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 22 Aug 2011
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 208, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013