Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessio Saccardo, S.J.

Bishop Emeritus of Ponta de Pedras, Para


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1940 BornMarano Vicentino, Italy
5 Sep 197029.9Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
16 Jan 200261.3AppointedBishop of Ponta de Pedras, Para, Brazil
6 Apr 200261.5Ordained BishopBishop of Ponta de Pedras, Para, Brazil
20 Apr 200261.5InstalledBishop of Ponta de Pedras, Para, Brazil
23 Sep 201575.0RetiredBishop of Ponta de Pedras, Para, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Alessio Saccardo:
Bishop Alessio Saccardo S.J. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Ponta de Pedras

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ponta de Pedras.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 167, Number 14,161
  • r: Bollettino, 23 Sep 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015