Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joaquim de Lange, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Tefé, Amazonas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Mar 1906BornSint Nicolaasga, Netherlands
25 Jul 193327.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
19 Jul 194640.3AppointedPrefect of Tefé, Brazil
4 Sep 195044.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Tefé, Amazonas, Brazil
18 Apr 195246.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Photice
18 Apr 195246.1AppointedPrelate of Tefé, Amazonas, Brazil
6 Jul 195246.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Photice
26 May 197872.2ResignedTitular Bishop of Photice
15 Dec 198276.7RetiredPrelate of Tefé, Amazonas, Brazil
14 Jul 199286.3DiedPrelate Emeritus of Tefé, Amazonas, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Joaquim de Lange:
Bishop Joaquim de Lange C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of Tefé

  • a priest for 58.9 years
  • a bishop for 40.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1952, Number 63

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015