Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Mário de Miranda Vilas-Boas

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Paraíba, Paraiba

Titular Archbishop of Gibba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Aug 1903BornRio Grande
6 Dec 192522.3Ordained PriestPriest
26 May 193834.8AppointedBishop of Garanhuns, Pernambuco, Brazil
30 Oct 193835.2Ordained BishopBishop of Garanhuns, Pernambuco, Brazil
10 Sep 194441.1AppointedArchbishop of Belém do Pará, Para, Brazil
5 Jan 194541.4InstalledArchbishop of Belém do Pará, Para, Brazil
23 Nov 195653.3AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
23 Nov 195653.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cyrrhus
20 Jun 195955.9AppointedArchbishop of Paraíba, Paraiba, Brazil
18 May 196561.8ResignedArchbishop of Paraíba, Paraiba, Brazil
18 May 196561.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Gibba
23 Feb 196864.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Paraíba, Paraiba, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Mário de Miranda Vilas-Boas:
Archbishop Mário de Miranda Vilas-Boas (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Paraíba

  • a priest for 42.2 years
  • a bishop for 29.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1938, Number 86

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013