Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop João Batista Portocarrero Costa

Deceased

Coadjutor Archbishop of Olinda e Recife, Pernambuco, Brazil

Titular Archbishop of Selge


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jun 1904Born
30 Oct 192723.3Ordained PriestPriest
31 Jul 194339.1AppointedBishop of Mossoró, Rio Grande do Norte, Brazil
7 Nov 194339.4Ordained BishopBishop of Mossoró, Rio Grande do Norte, Brazil
3 Jul 195349.0AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Olinda e Recife, Pernambuco, Brazil
3 Jul 195349.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Selge
6 Jan 195954.5DiedCoadjutor Archbishop of Olinda e Recife, Pernambuco, Brazil

MicroData Summary for João Batista Portocarrero Costa
Archbishop João Batista Portocarrero Costa (born , died ) Coadjutor Archbishop of Olinda e Recife

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVitória de Santo Antâo

  • a priest for 31.1 years
  • a bishop for 15.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1943, Number 70

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast