Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Terceiro de Sousa

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Penedo, Alagoas, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1908Born
30 Nov 193325.3Ordained PriestPriest
13 Feb 194839.5AppointedBishop of Caetité, Bahia, Brazil
20 Jun 194839.9Ordained BishopBishop of Caetité, Bahia, Brazil
9 Dec 195547.4ResignedBishop of Caetité, Bahia, Brazil
9 Dec 195547.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Salvador da Bahia, Brazil
9 Dec 195547.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Letopolis
9 Nov 195749.3AppointedBishop of Penedo, Alagoas, Brazil
24 Mar 197667.7ResignedBishop of Penedo, Alagoas, Brazil
14 Jul 198375.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Penedo, Alagoas, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Terceiro de Sousa
Bishop José Terceiro de Sousa (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Penedo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBôa Viagem

  • a priest for 49.6 years
  • a bishop for 35.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 66

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018