Catholic-Hierarchy DC

(Layman) Caetano Antônio Lima dos Santos, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ilhéus, Bahia

Note/Previous Titular See: (Renounced the Priesthood)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Oct 1916BornAltamira
15 Dec 194024.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
16 Apr 195841.5AppointedBishop of Ilhéus, Bahia, Brazil
10 Aug 195841.8Ordained BishopBishop of Ilhéus, Bahia, Brazil
19 Dec 196953.1ResignedBishop of Ilhéus, Bahia, Brazil
19 Dec 196953.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Tagarbala
197053.2ResignedTitular Bishop of Tagarbala
11 Nov 201498.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Ilhéus, Bahia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Caetano Antônio Lima dos Santos:
(Layman) Caetano Antônio Lima dos Santos O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ilhéus

  • a priest for 73.9 years
  • a bishop for 56.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • d: CB, 16 Nov 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 17 Nov 2014